NATIXIS_REGISTRATION_DOCUMENT_2017
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE Additional information on the directors’ positions
François Pérol President of the BPCE Management Board
Chairman of the Board of Directors First appointed: AGM of April 30, 2009 (Chairman of the Board: Board Meeting of April 30, 2009) Term expires: 2019 AGM (a) Member – Strategic Committee First appointed: Board Meeting of May 11, 2011
Born November 6, 1963 Nationality: French Natixis shares held: 60,000 Address: 50 avenue Pierre Mendès France 75201 Paris Cedex 13
2
François PÉROL
Attendance rate in 2017
Board of Directors: 100%
Strategic Committee: 100%
François Pérol is a graduate of HEC and the Institut d’Études Politiques de Paris, and alumnae of the École Nationale d’Administration. He held various positions at the Ministry of the Economy and Finance, beginning with the Treasury Department (1994-2002), and then on the Cabinets of Ministers Francis Mer and Nicolas Sarkozy (2002-2004). He then left the administration to join Rothschild & Cie Banque as Managing Partner from 2005 to 2007. François Pérol was appointed Deputy Secretary General to the President of the French Republic from 2007 to 2009. François Pérol has been President of the BPCE Management Board since 2009. Key advisory skills: expertise in strategy for banking and financial institutions, and in the French and international economic and financial environment.
Other offices held in 2017: Within Groupe BPCE President of the Management Board of BPCE (since 07.31.2009) a Chairman of the Board of Directors of Crédit Foncier (since 04.26.2010) a Chairman of CE Holding Participations (formerly CE Holding Promotion) a (since 06.30.2010) Member of the Board of Sopassure (since 03.23.2009) a Permanent Representative of BPCE Maroc, Member of the Board of a Banque Centrale Populaire (1) (since 2012) Permanent Representative of BPCE, General Partner of SCA a ECUFONCIER (since 2011) Outside Groupe BPCE Member of the Board of: CNP Assurances (1) (since 04.21.2009) a
Compliance with rules governing the number of offices held
Afep-Medef code: compliant
French Monetary and Financial Code: compliant
Offices held in previous fiscal years
2013
2014
2015
2016
Member (since 2009) then a Vice-Chairman (since September 2013) of the Executive Committee of the Fédération Bancaire Française Member of the Board of Musée a d’Orsay (2) (until 09.21.2013) Permanent Representative of a BPCE, Manager of SCI Ponant Plus (since 08.04.2010) Permanent Representative of a BPCE, Chairman of Banque Populaire Création (since 04.08.2011) Chairman of the European Savings a Banks group
} (until 08.31.2015)
a then Chairman (since 09.01.2014)
} (until 12.03.2014)
} (until 12.28.2015)
} (until 06.12.2015) (a) 2019 AGM called to approve the financial statements for the year ended December 31, 2018. (1) Listed company. (2) Company outside Groupe BPCE.
39
Natixis Registration Document 2017
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs